Ortiz-Singh, Janice (CPSO#: 96864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Tagalog

Education:De La Salle University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3Y5
Phone: (905) 792-0074
Fax: (905) 792-0078
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Singh and J. Ortiz-Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ortiz-Singh ( CPSO# 96864 )
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 96574 )

Business Address:
101-2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 792-0074

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Janice Ortiz-Singh may practice medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.