Orzech, Neil Bryan (CPSO#: 82551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 205
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-1242
Fax: (416) 431-0836
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL BRYAN ORZECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORZECH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012