Osborn, David Douglas (CPSO#: 31698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2013