Osman, Fahima Aden (CPSO#: 81212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Somalian

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 304
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 446-7626
Fax: (416) 446-7625
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Osman ( CPSO# 81212 )

Business Address:
304 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 446-7626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHIMA ADEN OSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009