Osmond, Allison Leanne (CPSO#: 93046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 11E 444
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 978-7535
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON LEANNE OSMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2018