Ostro, Jacqueline Anne (CPSO#: 91198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 318
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: (416) 289-2168
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klinghoffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ostro ( CPSO# 91198 )
Dr. Z. Klinghoffer ( CPSO# 86213 )

Business Address:
402 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 479-7680

Business Address:
318 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-2166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANNE OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013