Ostrowski, Leisha Nicole (CPSO#: 77607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leisha Ostrowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ostrowski ( CPSO# 77607 )

Business Address:
Highlands Health Network
Department of Family Medicine
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-6190

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEISHA NICOLE OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 11 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2004