Oswald, Anna Elfiky (CPSO#: 81196)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006