Otero Fuentes, Carmen Gloria (CPSO#: 72923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Hospital and Cancer
Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmout Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: 9053871966
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Simcoe General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: 519 426 0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
Suite 103
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: 905 828 2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 905 945 2253
Fax: 905 945 5016
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carmen Otero Fuentes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Otero Fuentes ( CPSO# 72923 )

Business Address:
HHSC Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Jul 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Carmen  Gloria  Otero  Fuentes  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            diagnostic radiology, only.