Ott, Monica Sophia (CPSO#: 87037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Gp Headquarters
Directorate Medical Policy
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-901-9531
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Arnprior&District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: 613-623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Dr
PO Box 129
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Ott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2013


Corporation Name: Monica Ott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ott ( CPSO# 87037 )

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA SOPHIA OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 14 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008