Otto, George Williams (CPSO#: 54197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Acholi, English, Swahili

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
2111 Jane Street
North York ON  M3M 1A2
Phone: (416) 241-0515
Fax: (416) 241-4318
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George W. Otto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 16, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George Williams Otto,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Otto to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Otto will abide by the Recommendations of the College Assessor with
                  respect to working with a Physician Assistant.


            As from 12:01 a.m., October 6, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. George Williams Otto:

                  (i)   Dr. Otto shall participate in and successfully complete an
                        educational program satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a
                        report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr.
                        Otto's progress and compliance.  Dr. Otto shall complete this
                        requirement by December 31, 2015 or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Otto shall not complete any Special Diet Allowance forms unless
                        he has submitted the Special Diet Allowance form, along with the
                        corresponding patient chart, to a physician approved by the College
                        in its sole discretion (the "Monitor"), and that Monitor has
                        reviewed, approved and co-signed every Special Diet Allowance form
                        prior to Dr. Otto providing this form to his patient(s).  The
                        Monitor shall sign an undertaking to the College in the form
                        attached hereto as Schedule "A", will agree to maintain a log of
                        all Special Diet Allowance forms that have been approved and
                        co-signed, and to report any irregularity to the College;
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Otto shall retain a copy of all Special Diet Allowance forms in
                        the patient chart.  Dr. Otto shall also maintain a log of all
                        Special Diet Allowance forms that he has completed which he will
                        submit to the College along with the corresponding patient chart
                        upon request. 
                  
                  (iv)  Dr. Otto shall inform the College of each and every location where
                        he practises including, but not limited to hospitals, clinics, and
                        offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his "Practice
                        Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall
                        inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location, for the
                        purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order;
                  
                  (v)   Dr. Otto shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                        inspections of his Practice Location(s) and patient records by a
                        College representative for the purposes of monitoring his
                        compliance with this Order;
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Otto shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and
                        cooperate with inspections of his practice and patient charts by
                        the Monitor and College representatives for the purpose of
                        monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
                        Order.  Monitoring this Order shall include making inquiries of the
                        Ministry of Community and Social Services and/or the Ministry of
                        Health and Long Term Care regarding Dr. Otto's completion of, and
                        billing for, special diet allowance forms; and
                  
                  (vii) Dr. Otto shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                        implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Apr 2018
Summary:

On April 23, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. George Williams Otto committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Otto received a certificate of independent practice in 1988. He practises family medicine in 
Toronto. Dr. Otto failed to provide records in a timely manner when requested on behalf of 
three patients. 
 
 
Patient A 
     
On April 13, 2016, a lawyer for Patient A sent a letter by fax to Dr. Otto's office, requesting 
Patient A's complete client file and enclosing an executed authorization and direction. The fax 
was received by Dr. Otto's office. Dr. Otto failed to respond to the request. 
     
On August 15, 2016, Patient A's lawyer sent another letter to Dr. Otto's office by fax and 
by regular mail. He repeated his request for Patient A's file and noted that time was of the 
essence. The letter was received by Dr. Otto's office. Dr. Otto failed to respond to the   
request. 
     
On September 28, 2016, Patient A's lawyer contacted the College regarding Dr. Otto's 
ongoing failure to provide Patient A's file as requested. The College investigator 
requested Dr. Otto's response by letters dated October 3, 2016 and November 14, 2016. 
     
On December 9, 2016, Dr. Otto submitted a letter of response to the College. In his letter, 
Dr. Otto advised that he had provided the records to Patient A's counsel on October 1, 
2016. 
     
Patient B 
     
On November 16, 2015, counsel for Patient B sent a letter by regular mail to Dr. Otto's  
office, requesting Patient B's complete client file and enclosing an executed authorization and 
direction. The letter was received by Dr. Otto's office. Dr. Otto failed to respond to the   
request. 
     
Counsel for Patient B sent two further letters to Dr. Otto's office by regular mail on January 
18, 2016 and June 14, 2016, repeating his request for Patient B's file. Both letters were 
received by Dr. Otto's office. The final letter stated in bold that the matter had become 
urgent. Dr. Otto failed to respond to these requests. 
     
On August 24, 2016, counsel for Patient B contacted the College regarding Dr. Otto's 
ongoing failure to provide Patient B's file as requested. The College investigator requested 
Dr. Otto's response by letters dated August 30, 2016 and October 25, 2016. 
     
On December 9, 2016, Dr. Otto submitted a letter of response to the College. In his letter, 
Dr. Otto advised that he had provided the records to Patient B's counsel on October 19,   
2016. 
 
Patient C 
 
On January 4, 2017, the College received a letter from counsel for Patient C requesting 
assistance in obtaining copies of her client’s records from Dr. Otto. As advised in her 
letter, Patient C's counsel had sent four requests to Dr. Otto for Patient C's records by letters 
dated February 12, March 12, April 14 and May 14, 2014. The final three request letters 
included the following statement in bold font: "If you have not seen this patient, please 
confirm in writing." Dr. Otto failed to respond to these requests. 
     
In his response to the College, dated February 16, 2017, Dr. Otto stated that he had no record of 
receiving the requests from Patient C's counsel and apologized if the letters were received and 
missed by an administrative error. Dr. Otto also noted that Patient C's first name was spelled 
inconsistently, in that a single letter in the middle of Patient C's first name was different in 
counsel's letter and in the four request letters. Dr. Otto stated that he did have records 
related to a patient with the name indicated on the request letters and would provide them 
upon receipt of an executed consent form. Patient C's surname was spelled correctly 
throughout, and her birthdate was included in the four request letters. 
 
Relevant College History 
 
Dr. Otto has been the subject of a number of prior investigations, cautions and disciplinary 
decisions by the College. 
 
In responding to the investigations regarding the complaints made on behalf of Patients A and 
B, Dr. Otto advised the College investigator on December 8, 2016 that in order to prevent 
similar oversights and delays, he has directed that all requests for patient records received 
by his office be logged into a journal, that each week, he personally reviews the journal to 
ensure requests have been attended to in a timely manner, and that if they are not, he 
personally ensures his office staff immediately attends to the request. Dr. Otto indicated 
that he is confident that the system now implemented at his office will assist in responding 
to patient record requests in a timely and appropriate manner. 
 
Dr. Otto's previous involvement with the College includes the following: 
 
-  In November 2012, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (the ICRC) 
   cautioned Dr. Otto in person and accepted his undertaking in resolution of an 
   investigation into issues regarding his practice, including his use of a physician 
   assistant and his inadequate record-keeping. Among other things, Dr. Otto 
   undertook to complete a medical record-keeping course.  
-  On May 1, 2013, the ICRC advised and cautioned Dr. Otto in two separate cases to 
   respond promptly and properly to requests for patient records. In one case, counsel 
   for the patient advised that he had written four letters to Dr. Otto requesting a copy 
   of the patient's records and had telephoned on numerous occasions. In the other case, 
   counsel for the patient advised that he had written three letters requesting records on 
   the patient's behalf and had called numerous times. In both cases, Dr. Otto advised 
   the College that he had since set up a binder to record patient record requests, which 
   he reviewed weekly.  
-  In a decision dated October 5, 2015, relating to his completion of Special Diet 
   Allowance forms, the Discipline Committee made findings of professional 
   misconduct. Dr. Otto admitted that his record-keeping did not meet the standard of 
   practice. The Committee administered a public reprimand, suspended Dr. Otto's 
   registration for two months, ordered he pay a $10,000 fine and imposed a number 
   of other terms. The Committee noted that Dr. Otto had since completed the medical 
   record-keeping course in accordance with his previous undertaking, and ordered that 
   he also complete an educational program in ethics.  
 
Disposition 
 
On April 23, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Otto’s Certificate of Registration for period of 3 months, to 
   commence on May 7, 2018; 
    
-  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Otto’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
    
   Records Log 
   (a) Dr. Otto shall maintain a log of all requests for the release of Personal Health 
       Information (“PHI”), which shall include a copy of the requests received, the date such 
       requests were received, and the date of Dr. Otto’s response (the “Log”). Dr. Otto shall 
       also include a copy of the request and his response in the relevant patient’s clinical 
       record; 
   (b) Dr. Otto shall submit a copy of the Log to the College thirty (30), sixty (60) and ninety 
       (90) days following the date of this Order, and every two (2) months thereafter, for a 
       total period of twenty-four (24) months; 
       
   Education 
   (c) Dr. Otto shall complete a physician practice management course acceptable to the 
       College within six (6) months of the date of this Order; 
 
   Preceptorship 
   (d) Within thirty (30) days of the conclusion of the suspension of his Certificate of 
       Registration described above in paragraph 3, Dr. Otto shall retain, at his own expense, a 
       College-approved clinical supervisor or supervisors (the “Preceptor”) with respect to 
       effective office administration, and in particular the timely response to requests for PHI. 
       The Preceptor will sign an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule “A” to the 
       Order, dated April 23, 2018; 
   (e) Dr. Otto shall meet with the Preceptor a total of six (6) times over a period of twelve 
       (12) months (the “Preceptorship”): an initial meeting, then once after one (1) month, 
       once after a further two (2) months; and once every three (3) months thereafter until the 
       conclusion of the Preceptorship; 
   (f) The meetings shall include a review of the Log and related correspondence, including 
       the requests received, the responses by Dr. Otto and the associated records and patient 
       charts to ensure appropriate documentation. The Preceptor may conduct an additional 
       review of any records or documents deemed necessary for the purposes of the 
    Preceptorship. The Preceptor may also make inquiries of relevant individuals, including 
    staff or colleagues; 
(g) Dr. Otto shall cooperate fully with the Preceptor and shall abide by the 
    recommendations of the Preceptor, including but not limited to, any recommended 
    practice improvements and professional development; 
(h) The Preceptor shall submit quarterly reports to the College; 
(i) If a person who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order dated April 23, 
    2018 is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Otto shall, within 
    twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the 
    same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure 
    that it is delivered to the College within that time; 
(j) If Dr. Otto is unable to obtain a Preceptor in accordance with this Order, he shall cease 
    to practice until such time as he has obtained a Preceptor acceptable to the College; 
(k) If Dr. Otto is required to cease practice as a result of paragraph (4)(j) above, this will 
    constitute a term, condition or limitation on his Certificate of Registration and that term, 
    condition or limitation will be included on the public register; 
(l) Dr. Otto shall consent to the disclosure by his Preceptor to the College, and by the 
    College to his Preceptor, of all information the Preceptor or the College deems 
    necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Preceptor’s undertaking and Dr. Otto’s 
    compliance with this Order; 
             
Reassessment 
(m) Within six (6) months of completing the Preceptorship required above, Dr. Otto shall 
    undergo a reassessment with regard to effective office administration by a College-
    appointed Assessor; 
(n) The reassessment may include (at the College’s discretion) a review of Dr. Otto’s Log 
    and related documentation; an interview with Dr. Otto, interviews with colleagues and 
    staff, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College; 
(o) The results of this assessment shall be reported to the College; 
(p) Dr. Otto shall abide by all recommendations with regard to practice management made 
    by the College-appointed Assessor; 
(q) If Dr. Otto is of the view that any of the Assessor’s recommendations are unreasonable, 
    he shall have thirty (30) days following receipt of the recommendation within which to 
    provide the College with his submissions in this regard. Thereafter, the Inquiries, 
    Complaints and Reports Committee (the “ICRC”) will consider his submissions and 
    make a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, 
    are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or 
    restrictions on his practice, and that decision will be provided to Dr. Otto; 
(r) Following the decision referenced in paragraph (4)(q) above, Dr. Otto shall abide by 
    those recommendations of the Assessor that the ICRC has determined are reasonable. 
     
Other 
(s) Dr. Otto shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in any 
    jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within fifteen 15 days of this Order and shall 
    inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of 
    commencing practice at that location; 
   (t) Dr. Otto shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice 
       Location(s) and patient records for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his 
       compliance with the terms of this Order; 
   (u) Dr. Otto shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health 
       Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, 
       in order for the College to monitor his compliance with this Order. 
   (v) Dr. Otto shall consent to the sharing of information among the Preceptor, the Assessor 
       and the College, as any of them deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their 
       respective obligations; 
   (w) Dr. Otto shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
       terms of this Order. 
 
-  Dr. Otto attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
    
-  Dr. Otto pay costs to the College for one half-day hearing in the amount of $6,000 within 
   sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. 
 
On May 4, 2018, Dr. Otto appealed the decision on penalty of the Discipline Committee to the 
Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the appeal operates as a stay of the decision pending the outcome of the appeal. 
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is not in effect.

Hearing Date(s): April 23 ,2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Oct 2015
Summary:

 On October 5, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Otto committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Otto admitted to the allegations. 
 
In March 2012, the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care (the “Ministry”) expressed concerns 
to the College regarding Dr. Otto’s completion of special diet allowance (“SDA”) applications.  
The Ministry reviewed 25 patient records which were selected based on claim submissions of an 
assessment code and a code for completing an application for a SDA. The records submitted 
were for families where all of the patients within the family were billed on the same service date.  
Fifteen of the records were for patients eighteen and under. The Ministry’s review revealed that 
of those fifteen records, thirteen records included the phrase ‘anceiform rash all over body’ and 
also noted an opinion of lactose intolerance or milk allergy.  
 
Based on the information received from the Ministry, the College commenced an investigation. 
In the course of its investigation, the College received billings for the 25 patients reviewed by the 
Ministry. 
 
The College retained the services of an expert, Dr. X, who opined that of the 24 charts she 
reviewed, only three met the standard of care with respect to the completion of the SDA 
application forms. In general, documentation and investigations to support the conditions 
indicated in the SDA forms was lacking. It was also noted that many patients had frequent 
assessments over a very short period of time, prior to the completion of the SDA forms, and that 
many of the clinical entries for those repeat assessments were identical. 
 
During the College’s investigation, in November 2012, Dr. Otto participated in a medical record-
keeping course and submitted proof of completion to the College.  
 
In May 2014, Dr. X reviewed ten additional records of Dr. Otto and found that four of them did 
not meet the standard of care of the profession in relation to his completion of SDA forms, in 
that there was no documentation of the symptoms, investigations or treatment recommendations 
to support the condition(s) reported on the SDA form. However, Dr. X noted improvement with 
regards to Dr. Otto’s charting and patient assessments that were conducted to support the clinical 
conditions indicated in the SDA and to satisfy the requirements of the Ministry when completing 
the SDA forms, and that Dr. Otto provided sound rationale for supporting dietary and lifestyle 
modifications for the management of hypercholesterolemia and hypertension for his patients and 
for supporting the SDA claim for his patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- Dr. Otto appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Otto’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, 
commencing at 12:01 a.m. on October 6, 2015. 
-the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Otto’s certificate of 
registration: 
   (i) Dr. Otto shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program satisfactory 
   to the College in Ethics, with a report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr. 
   Otto’s progress and compliance.  Dr. Otto shall complete this requirement by December 31, 
   2015 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity 
   thereafter; 
   (ii) Dr. Otto shall not complete any Special Diet Allowance forms unless he has submitted the 
   Special Diet Allowance form, along with the corresponding patient chart, to a physician 
   approved by the College in its sole discretion (the “Monitor”), and that Monitor has reviewed, 
   approved and co-signed every Special Diet Allowance form prior to Dr. Otto providing this 
   form to his patient(s).  The Monitor shall sign an undertaking to the College in the form 
   attached [to the Order] as Schedule “A”, will agree to maintain a log of all Special Diet 
   Allowance forms that have been approved and co-signed, and to report any irregularity to the 
   College; 
   (iii) Dr. Otto shall retain a copy of all Special Diet Allowance forms in the patient chart.  Dr. 
   Otto shall also maintain a log of all Special Diet Allowance forms that he has completed 
   which he will submit to the College along with the corresponding patient chart upon request.  
   (iv) Dr. Otto shall inform the College of each and every location where he practises including, 
   but not limited to hospitals, clinics, and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his “Practice 
   Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and 
   all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location, 
   for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order; 
   (v) Dr. Otto shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice 
   Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring his 
   compliance with this Order; 
   (vi) Dr. Otto shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and cooperate with 
   inspections of his practice and patient charts by the Monitor and College representatives for 
   the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.  
   Monitoring this Order shall include making inquiries of the Ministry of Community and 
   Social Services and/or the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care regarding Dr. Otto’s 
   completion of, and billing for, special diet allowance forms; and 
   (vii) Dr. Otto shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
   terms of this Order. 
 - Dr. Otto shall, within six (6) months, pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of 
 $10,000.00, and that Dr. Otto shall provide proof of this payment to the Registrar of the College. 
 - Dr. Otto pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460, within sixty (60) days of the date of 
this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 5, 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Current Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:
-Do not prescribe any narcotics listed under Schedule 1 of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act;
-Allow Detective IBBOTT badge #720 or his designate access to the narcotic monitoring system records belonging to you and your practice as well as the OHIP billing records belonging to, accessed by you and maintained by you;


Source: Member
Active Date: May 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that George W. OTTO, on two counts, between October 1, 2015 and January 20, 2016 at the Town of Richmond Hill did conspire together with 3 other people to commit the indictable offence of trafficking in a controlled substance, to wit; Fentanyl, contrary to Sections 5(1) and (2) of the Controlled Drugs and Substance Act, contrary to Section 465(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: April 15, 2016
Place of charges: Newmarket, ON
York Regional Police