Ouellet, Annie (CPSO#: 76327)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2002 to 07 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2003 to 07 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2004