Ouellet, Tracy Lara (CPSO#: 72216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Family Health Team
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 672-2273
Fax: (519) 672-2668
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Ouellet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ouellet ( CPSO# 72216 )

Business Address:
London Family Health Team
1 - 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 672-2273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LARA OUELLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000