Oukachbi, Salima (CPSO#: 89792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Kabyle

Education:UNIVERSITE D'ALGER, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Hospitalist Service
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6030
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salima Oukachbi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Oukachbi ( CPSO# 89792 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Hospitalist Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALIMA OUKACHBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUKACHBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2008 to 16 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Nov 2008 to 23 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Aug 2009 to 23 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2011