Overington, Jeffrey David (CPSO#: 105765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 481-3255
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Jeffrey  David Overington shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate  medical  education  program  in  which  Dr.  Overington  is
                  enrolled at McMaster University.

            (2)   In  Dr. Overington's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program,  Dr.  Overington  shall  prescribe drugs only for in-patients or
                  out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with
                  the department where Dr. Overington  is  properly practising medicine and
                  to which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department
                  as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Overington's  practice  in  the  postgraduate medical  education
                  program, Dr. Overington shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Overington may practise critical care medicine  and  to the extent of
                  his employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation and  St.  Joseph's
                  Health  Care  System-Hamilton,  while under supervision coordinated by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Overington's practice specified  in  paragraph (4), Dr. Overington
                  may not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration  expires,  and  Dr.  Overington  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Overington  is  no  longer  enrolled  in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate medical education provided  by  a  medical  school  in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Overington no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and Dr.  Overington must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified  in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Overington's practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding   knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Overington's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for Dr.  Overington to engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Overington's  employment  as  specified  in  paragraph (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Overington takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr. Overington may not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical  education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until  Dr.  Overington applies for a new certificate
                  of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on March  22,  2018.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate  of  registration  expires  on  June 30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.