Owen, James Richard Mark (CPSO#: 93015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Owen ( CPSO# 93015 )

Business Address:
Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES RICHARD MARK OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012