Owen, Julian James (CPSO#: 88534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 527-7051
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julian Owen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Owen ( CPSO# 88534 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN JAMES OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013