Owen, Scott Peter (CPSO#: 93291)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2011