Oyeniran, Idowu Elkanah (CPSO#: 92264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
91 Champlain Street
North Bay ON  P1B 7M3
Phone: (705) 495-2323
Fax: (705) 495-3281
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Idowu Oyeniran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Oyeniran ( CPSO# 92264 )

Business Address:
91 Champlain Street
North Bay ON  P1B 7M3
Phone Number: (705) 495-2323

Business Address:
685 Bloem Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z5
Phone Number: (705) 476-1413

Business Address:
50 College Drive
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IDOWU ELKANAH OYENIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYENIRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 15 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011