Ozols, Dina Yvonne (CPSO#: 75860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 252-4994
Fax: (519) 252-4995
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3320 College Ave
Windsor ON  N9C 0E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-6002
Fax: (519) 258-7896
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA YVONNE OZOLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZOLS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2002