Howard, Peter Robert Stuart (CPSO#: 74992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89323
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Peter Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Hospital
AG31-a
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ROBERT STUART HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005