First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |