Thomas, Prashant Jacob (CPSO#: 112104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chacko ( CPSO# 68076 )
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 112104)

Business Address:
2100 Medical Centre
102 - 2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 438-8517


Corporation Name: PJ Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 112104)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASHANT JACOB THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2018