Pabani, Wahid (CPSO#: 93329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 St George St.
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: (519) 583-2225
Fax: (519) 583-2250
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

370 Bayview Dr.
Barrie ON  L4N7L3
Canada
Phone: 705-721-0370
Fax: 705-797-2013
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West St
Simcoe ON  N3Y1T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wahid Pabani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pabani ( CPSO# 93329 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
807 St George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-2225

Business Address:
Grey-Bruce Health Services Wiarton
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 534-1269

Business Address:
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAHID PABANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PABANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012