Pace, Peter Jonathan Howard (CPSO#: 96123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 304
1221 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 995-2490
Fax: (705) 478-6507
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jonathan Pace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pace ( CPSO# 96123 )

Business Address:
304 - 1221 Algonquin
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 995-2490

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JONATHAN HOWARD PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016