Packer, Tamar (CPSO#: 57997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512-1 Young St
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 318-3877
Fax: (905) 318-0016
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard and Tamar Packer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Packer ( CPSO# 57997 )
Dr. R. Packer ( CPSO# 56954 )

Business Address:
Suite 512
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 318-3877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMAR PACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 01 Dec 1989
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2001