Paco, Charles Anthony (CPSO#: 62927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Liege, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster On.
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: 905-304-0062
Fax: 905 304-0058
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

45 Hannover Drive
St. Catherines Ontario
L2w1a3
Dynamic Endoscopy
St Catharines ON  L2W1A3
Canada
Phone: 905-684-9999
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

10 Cotrelle Blvd.
Unit 207
Brampton ON.
Castlemore Endoscopy
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: 905-794-4497
Fax: 905-794-7258
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2227 South Millway, Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles A. Paco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paco ( CPSO# 62927 )

Business Address:
Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Business Address:
303 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
4 - 45 Hannover
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 684-9999

Business Address:
207 - 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 794-4497

Business Address:
Provis Endoscopy Services
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY PACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1992