Padoin, Cintia Vontobel (CPSO#: 85511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Luterana do Brasil, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
7th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 3043
Fax: 4163236356
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cintia Vontobel Padoin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Padoin ( CPSO# 85511 )

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
7th Floor Suite 7217
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINTIA VONTOBEL PADOIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADOIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 14 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013