Page, Andrea Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite B710
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4789
Fax: (416) 480-4839
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA ELIZABETH PAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011