Pagnoux, Christian (CPSO#: 94177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 2 220
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8549
Fax: (416) 586-8766
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

France

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Christian Pagnoux may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Rheumatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Pagnoux holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pagnoux no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.