Paiement, Francois Leo (CPSO#: 72408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francois Paiement Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Paiement ( CPSO# 72408 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 314-4271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS LEO PAIEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIEMENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000