Paikin, Jeremy (CPSO#: 86585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Commercial Street
Suite 109
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 878-9805
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Paikin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paikin ( CPSO# 86585 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY PAIKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011