Paikin, Michelle Joy (CPSO#: 90637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Haroun, Michelle Joy (used until: 15 Jun 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 662
Fax: (905) 338-2998
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Paikin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Paikin ( CPSO# 90637 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE JOY PAIKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013