Painter, Richard William (CPSO#: 113204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Child and
Adolescent Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM PAINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAINTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018