Pakes, Barry Noah (CPSO#: 76565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Toronto ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-0933
Fax: (705) 792-0933
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2004 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY NOAH PAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004