Pal, Raveen S (CPSO#: 74739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong Wing 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6245
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raveen Pal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pal ( CPSO# 74739 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong Wing 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6


Corporation Name: Harminder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pal ( CPSO# 74739 )
Dr. H. Sandhu ( CPSO# 67810 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care Belleville
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward County
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVEEN S PAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009