Palardy, Melissa Karine (CPSO#: 95867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Palardy ( CPSO# 95867 )
Dr. M. O'Brien ( CPSO# 95834 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room EM 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA KARINE PALARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALARDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016