Palazzolo Penafiel, Jorge Alberto (CPSO#: 95009)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Cuyo, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 29 Jun 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 30 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2014