Palda, Valerie Anne (CPSO#: 60728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5541
Fax: (416) 864-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Kraemer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Palda ( CPSO# 60728 )
Dr. W. Kraemer ( CPSO# 60915 )

Business Address:
Suite 604
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 483-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE ANNE PALDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1990