Paliga, Aleksandra Augusta (CPSO#: 93451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501, Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899
Fax: 613-737-8853
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Paliga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Paliga ( CPSO# 93451 )

Business Address:
Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Critical Care Wing, Room 4114
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA AUGUSTA PALIGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALIGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016