Pallett, Ryan Christopher (CPSO#: 95714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone: 416-504-0628
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER PALLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014