Palombo, Alessandra Dana (CPSO#: 86647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brameast Family Physicians
Unit 38 Ground Floor
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sollazzo & Palombo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sollazzo ( CPSO# 86684 )
Dr. A. Palombo ( CPSO# 86647 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Brameast Family Health Organization
38 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALESSANDRA DANA PALOMBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALOMBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009