Pampaloni, Federico (CPSO#: 92029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Florence, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (289)-863-7412
Fax: (289)-863-7413
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GHA Surgical Center
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pampaloni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pampaloni ( CPSO# 92029 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
Woodbine Endoscopy
130 - 100 Renfrew Drive
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Phone Number: (905) 948-9119

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEDERICO PAMPALONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMPALONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013