Pamula, Andrea (CPSO#: 80693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Oxford Street East, Suite 300
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 850-3238
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pamula ( CPSO# 80693 )
Dr. P. Paul ( CPSO# 84253 )

Business Address:
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 645-2444

Business Address:
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA PAMULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008