Panchapakesan, Vivek (CPSO#: 79377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 628
115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 644-1840
Fax: (416) 644-1841
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

343-50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-4888
Fax: (905) 273-5581
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Panchapakesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Panchapakesan ( CPSO# 79377 )

Business Address:
316 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 644-1840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVEK PANCHAPAKESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANCHAPAKESAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008