Pandompatam, Meera (CPSO#: 91242)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2015 to 11 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2015