Pandya, Seema Rishikesh (CPSO#: 80184)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 27 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013