Pang, Benjamin (CPSO#: 92170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3700 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A8
Phone: (905) 295-4323
Fax: (905) 295-8876
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Pang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pang ( CPSO# 92170 )

Business Address:
3700 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A8
Phone Number: (905) 295-4323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012