Pang, Natalie J (CPSO#: 84252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: One Care Medical Clinic 1755 Brimley Rd Toronto, ON M1P 0A3
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Natalie J. Pang to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 5, 2017:

Dr. Pang has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.