Panju, Mohamed (CPSO#: 86660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44368
Fax: (905) 577-8013
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Main St W, Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 44386
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Panju Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Panju ( CPSO# 86660 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED PANJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANJU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011